Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/13/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/13/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/13/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/13/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/15/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/15/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/15/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 06/15/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/20/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/20/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/23/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/23/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/23/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/28/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/28/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/28/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/12/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/12/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/21/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/21/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/19/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/01/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/01/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/08/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/08/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/28/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/17/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/15/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/19/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/19/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/20/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/20/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/28/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/29/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/26/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/28/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/07/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/13/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/19/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/06/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew