Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 05/24/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/24/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/24/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/08/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/21/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/28/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/17/2005