Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/25/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/25/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/17/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/17/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/20/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/13/2005