Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/08/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/08/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/14/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/23/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/23/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/30/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/21/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/21/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/26/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/26/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/26/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/04/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/08/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/08/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/07/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/26/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/27/2006