Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/07/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/07/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/09/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/13/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/17/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/22/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/27/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/27/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/27/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/18/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/18/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/21/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/06/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/06/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/06/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/06/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/01/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/07/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/07/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/12/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/13/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/26/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew