Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/06/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/06/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/06/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/07/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/13/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew