Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/07/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/27/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/18/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/06/2005

Show cosponsors who withdrew