Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/07/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/09/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/13/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/27/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/18/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/21/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/01/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/12/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/26/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew