Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/11/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/13/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/13/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 11/08/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/14/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/14/2006