Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/30/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/15/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/18/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 11/18/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/28/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/28/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/05/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/05/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/26/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/26/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/26/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/17/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/17/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/26/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/26/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/07/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/07/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/12/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/12/2006