Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/10/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/16/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/12/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/13/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/17/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/17/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/27/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/07/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/07/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/14/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/06/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/26/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/16/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/16/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/17/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/08/2006