Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/07/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/09/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/16/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/11/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/29/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/08/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/08/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/14/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/15/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/20/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/21/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/28/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/29/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/17/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/06/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/08/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/08/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/03/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/03/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/11/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/07/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/29/2006