Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/15/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/15/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/15/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/15/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/15/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/17/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/17/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/17/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/17/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/17/2005