Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/08/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/23/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/26/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/06/2006