Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/02/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/02/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/02/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/16/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/16/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/16/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/02/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/02/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/16/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/25/2006