Refine your search

14 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/10/2005 Became Public Law No: 109-97.
11/10/2005 Signed by President.
11/04/2005 Presented to President.
11/03/2005 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 81 - 18. Record Vote Number: 282.
10/28/2005 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 318 - 63 (Roll no. 555).(consideration: CR H9394)
10/26/2005 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.(consideration: CR H9204-9240)
10/26/2005 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 109-255 filed.(text of conference report: CR H9204-9240)
10/25/2005 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
09/22/2005 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Bennett; Cochran; Specter; Bond; McConnell; Burns; Craig; Brownback; Stevens; Kohl; Harkin; Dorgan; Feinstein; Durbin; Johnson; Landrieu; Byrd.
09/22/2005 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 2. Record Vote Number: 241.(text: CR 9/26/2005 S10441-10453)
06/27/2005 Committee on Appropriations. Reported by Senator Bennett with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 109-92.
06/08/2005 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 408 - 18 (Roll no. 238).
06/03/2005 Introduced in House
06/02/2005 The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 109-102, by Mr. Bonilla.