There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Clean Energy Bonds Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow a credit to holders of qualified bonds issued to finance certain energy projects, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/08/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/08/2005Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/08/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/16/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/16/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/16/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/17/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/20/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/20/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/21/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/21/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/22/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/23/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/23/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/23/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/24/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/27/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/27/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/28/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/28/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/11/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/11/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/19/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/19/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/19/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/19/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/20/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/20/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/21/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/21/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/25/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/25/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/25/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/25/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/26/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/29/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/13/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/18/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/04/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/19/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/08/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (19)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2794. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/2005)

Clean Energy Bonds Act of 2005 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow holders of clean energy bonds a nonrefundable tax credit of 25 percent of an annual credit amount as determined by the Secretary of the Treasury. Defines "clean energy bond" as any bond issued by a clean energy bond lender, a cooperative electric company, a governmental body, or the Tennessee Valley Authority (TVA) that is used for capital expenditures for specified projects for producing electricity from certain renewable resources, such as wind, biomass, solar energy, small irrigation power, and municipal solid waste.

Sets forth rules for maturity limitations, arbitrage, and expenditures, including a requirement that 95 percent of proceeds from the sale of a bond issue be spent on a renewable resource project within five years from the date of a bond issuance. Terminates the authority to issue clean energy bonds after 2008.