Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/08/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/16/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/16/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/16/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/17/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/20/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/20/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/21/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/21/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/22/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/23/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/23/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/23/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/24/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/27/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/27/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/28/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/28/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/11/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/11/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/19/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/19/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/19/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/19/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/20/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/20/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/21/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/21/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/25/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/25/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/25/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/25/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/26/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/29/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/13/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/18/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/04/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/19/2006