Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/20/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/20/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/20/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/20/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/20/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/20/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/20/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/20/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/23/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/27/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/27/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/11/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/11/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/14/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/18/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/18/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/18/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/18/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/18/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/19/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/20/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/21/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/21/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/21/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/21/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/21/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/25/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/25/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/26/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/28/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/28/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/07/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/07/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/07/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/28/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/28/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/17/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/17/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/25/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/26/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/01/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 11/01/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/02/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/10/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/10/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 12/14/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/14/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/14/2006