Text: H.R.2808 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-285 (09/27/2006)

 
[109th Congress Public Law 285]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ285.109]

[[Page 120 STAT. 1215]]

Public Law 109-285
109th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration 
 of the bicentennial of the birth of Abraham Lincoln. <<NOTE: Sept. 27, 
                         2006 -  [H.R. 2808]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Abraham Lincoln 
Commemorative Coin Act. 31 USC 5112 note.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Abraham Lincoln Commemorative Coin 
Act''.
SEC. 2. FINDINGS.

    The Congress finds as follows:
            (1) Abraham Lincoln, the 16th President, was one of the 
        Nation's greatest leaders, demonstrating true courage during the 
        Civil War, one of the greatest crises in the Nation's history.
            (2) Born of humble roots in present-day LaRue County, 
        Kentucky, on February 12, 1809, Abraham Lincoln rose to the 
        Presidency through a combination of honesty, integrity, 
        intelligence, and commitment to the United States.
            (3) With the belief that all men were created equal, Abraham 
        Lincoln led the effort to free all slaves in the United States.
            (4) Abraham Lincoln had a generous heart, with malice toward 
        none and with charity for all.
            (5) Abraham Lincoln gave the ultimate sacrifice for his 
        country, dying from an assassin's bullet on April 15, 1865.
            (6) The year 2009 will be the bicentennial anniversary of 
        the birth of Abraham Lincoln.
            (7) The Abraham Lincoln Bicentennial Commission has been 
        charged by Congress with planning the celebration of Lincoln's 
        bicentennial.
            (8) The proceeds from a commemorative coin will help fund 
        the celebration and the continued study of the life of Lincoln.
SEC. 3. COIN SPECIFICATIONS.

    (a) $1 Silver Coins.--The Secretary of the Treasury (hereafter in 
this Act referred to as the ``Secretary'') shall mint and issue not more 
than 500,000 $1 coins, which shall--
            (1) weigh 26.73 grams;
            (2) have a diameter of 1.500 inches; and
            (3) contain 90 percent silver and 10 percent copper.

    (b) Legal Tender.--The coins minted under this Act shall be legal 
tender, as provided in section 5103 of title 31, United States Code.

[[Page 120 STAT. 1216]]

    (c) Numismatic Items.--All coins minted under this Act shall be 
considered to be numismatic items.
SEC. 4. DESIGN OF COINS.

    (a) Design Requirements.--
            (1) In general.--The design of the coins minted under this 
        Act shall be emblematic of the life and legacy of President 
        Abraham Lincoln.
            (2) Designation and inscriptions.--On each coin minted under 
        this Act there shall be--
                    (A) a designation of the value of the coin;
                    (B) an inscription of the year ``2009''; and
                    (C) inscriptions of the words ``Liberty'', ``In God 
                We Trust'', ``United States of America'', and ``E 
                Pluribus Unum''.

    (b) Selection.--The design for the coins minted under this Act shall 
be--
            (1) selected by the Secretary after consultation with the 
        Commission of Fine Arts and the Abraham Lincoln Bicentennial 
        Commission; and
            (2) reviewed by the Citizens Coinage Advisory Committee.
SEC. 5. ISSUANCE OF COINS.

    (a) Quality of Coins.--Coins minted under this Act shall be issued 
in uncirculated and proof qualities.
    (b) Mint Facility.--Only 1 facility of the United States Mint may be 
used to strike any particular quality of the coins minted under this 
Act.
    (c) Period for Issuance.--The Secretary may issue coins minted under 
this Act only during the 1-year period beginning on January 1, 2009.
SEC. 6. SALE OF COINS.

    (a) Sale Price.--The coins issued under this Act shall be sold by 
the Secretary at a price equal to the sum of--
            (1) the face value of the coins;
            (2) the surcharge provided in section 7(a) with respect to 
        such coins; and
            (3) the cost of designing and issuing the coins (including 
        labor, materials, dies, use of machinery, overhead expenses, 
        marketing, and shipping).

    (b) Bulk Sales.--The Secretary shall make bulk sales of the coins 
issued under this Act at a reasonable discount.
    (c) Prepaid Orders.--
            (1) In general.--The Secretary shall accept prepaid orders 
        for the coins minted under this Act before the issuance of such 
        coins.
            (2) Discount.--Sale prices with respect to prepaid orders 
        under paragraph (1) shall be at a reasonable discount.
SEC. 7. SURCHARGES.

    (a) In General.--All sales of coins issued under this Act shall 
include a surcharge of $10 per coin.
    (b) Distribution.--Subject to section 5134(f)(1), title 31, United 
States Code, all surcharges received by the Secretary from the sale of 
coins issued under this Act shall be promptly paid by the Secretary to 
the Abraham Lincoln Bicentennial Commission to further the work of the 
Commission.

[[Page 120 STAT. 1217]]

    (c) Audits.--The Abraham Lincoln Bicentennial Commission shall be 
subject to the audit requirements of section 5134(f)(2) of title 31, 
United States Code.
    (d) Limitation.--Notwithstanding subsection (a), no surcharge may be 
included with respect to the issuance under this Act of any coin during 
a calendar year if, as of the time of such issuance, the issuance of 
such coin would result in the number of commemorative coin programs 
issued during such year to exceed the annual 2 commemorative coin 
program issuance limitation under section 5112(m)(1) of title 31, United 
States Code (as in effect on the date of the enactment of this Act). The 
Secretary of the Treasury may issue guidance to carry out this 
subsection.

    Approved September 27, 2006.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 2808 (S. 811):
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 152 (2006):
            Sept. 6, considered and passed House.
            Sept. 8, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>