Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/13/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/22/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/23/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/13/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/07/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/07/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 12/07/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/16/2006