Committees: H.R.2829 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform06/09/2005 Referred to
06/16/2005 Markup by
11/18/2005 Reported by H. Rept. 109-315,Part 1
House Judiciary06/09/2005 Referred to
03/02/2006 Markup by
03/03/2006 Reported by H. Rept. 109-315,Part 3
House Energy and Commerce06/09/2005 Referred to
03/03/2006 Reported by H. Rept. 109-315,Part 2
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/17/2005 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)06/09/2005 Referred to
03/03/2006 Discharged from
House Education and the Workforce11/18/2005 Referred to
03/03/2006 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary03/13/2006 Referred to