Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/21/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/21/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/23/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/24/2005