Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/06/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/25/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/25/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/25/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/01/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/01/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/01/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/01/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/02/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/02/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/02/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/08/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/08/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/09/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/09/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/10/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/17/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/02/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/19/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/14/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/16/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/19/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/19/2006