Refine your search

13 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/30/2005 Became Public Law No: 109-148. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2005 Signed by President.
12/28/2005 Presented to President.
12/21/2005 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 93 - 0. Record Vote Number: 366.(consideration: CR 12/22/2005 S14254)
12/19/2005 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 308 - 106, 2 Present (Roll no. 669).(consideration: CR H12269)
12/18/2005 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 109-359 filed.(text of conference report: CR H12293-12641)
10/07/2005 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Stevens; Cochran; Specter; Domenici; Bond; McConnell; Shelby; Gregg; Hutchison; Burns; Inouye; Byrd; Leahy; Harkin; Dorgan; Durbin; Reid; Feinstein; Mikulski.
10/07/2005 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay. 97 - 0. Record Vote Number: 254.(text: CR S11256-11275)
09/29/2005 By Senator Stevens from Committee on Appropriations filed written report. Report No. 109-141.
09/28/2005 Committee on Appropriations. Reported by Senator Stevens with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/20/2005 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 398 - 19 (Roll no. 287).
06/10/2005 The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 109-119, by Mr. Young (FL).
06/10/2005 Introduced in House