Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/22/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/23/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/27/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/28/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/28/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/28/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/12/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/20/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/25/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/12/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/12/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/19/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/07/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/07/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/17/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/17/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/17/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/17/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/14/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/14/2006