Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 06/14/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/15/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/15/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/15/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/15/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/15/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/17/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/21/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/21/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/21/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/21/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/21/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/22/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/24/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/24/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/24/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/24/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/24/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/28/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/28/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/29/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/30/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/12/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/12/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/12/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/12/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/19/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/28/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/22/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/22/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/22/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/22/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/22/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/06/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/06/2005