Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/16/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/15/2006