Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/06/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/25/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/25/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/01/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/01/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/01/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/01/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/01/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/01/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/01/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/01/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/01/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/01/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/09/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/14/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/15/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/15/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/16/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/16/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/16/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/16/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/09/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/06/2005