Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/27/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/29/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/21/2005