Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/15/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/11/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/12/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/06/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/09/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/31/2006