Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/15/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/15/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/15/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/15/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/15/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/15/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/15/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/24/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/24/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/14/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/14/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/21/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/22/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/22/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/22/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/08/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/29/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/19/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/06/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/06/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/13/2006