Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/16/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/17/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/27/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/27/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/27/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/27/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/27/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/18/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/18/2005