Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/17/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/27/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/29/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/07/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/26/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/02/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/16/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/16/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/18/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/07/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/07/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/07/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 12/14/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/08/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/08/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/08/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/08/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/08/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 02/16/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/08/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/15/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/15/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/30/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/05/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/19/2006