Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/16/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/16/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/14/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/19/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/07/2006