Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/23/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/29/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/29/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/29/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/12/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/12/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/12/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/12/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/12/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/14/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/14/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/14/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/14/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/14/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/14/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/14/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/19/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/19/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/19/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/19/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/19/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/19/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/21/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/21/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/21/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/22/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/22/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/22/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/22/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/28/2005