Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/22/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/22/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/22/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/22/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/28/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/13/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/13/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/13/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/13/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/13/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/20/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/20/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/20/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/20/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/20/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/21/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/28/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/28/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/28/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/15/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/15/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/29/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/29/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/26/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/16/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/16/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/16/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/17/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/09/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 12/08/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/08/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/08/2006