There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Dr. James Allen Disabled Veterans Equity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve compensation benefits for veterans in certain cases of impairment of vision involving both eyes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/17/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/06/2006Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
06/28/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/17/2005Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/17/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/22/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/22/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/26/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/27/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/27/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/27/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/29/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/29/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/06/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/06/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/06/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/06/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/20/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/06/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/18/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 11/01/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/14/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/15/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/28/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/28/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/11/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/17/2005 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs06/28/2005 Referred to
04/06/2006 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2963. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/17/2005)

Dr. James Allen Disabled Veterans Equity Act - Requires the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to pay special disability compensation due to a veteran's loss of paired organs when the veteran has suffered impairment of vision compensable to a degree of ten percent or more (currently, blindness) in one eye as a result of a service-connected disability and impairment of vision (currently, blindness) in the other eye as a result of a non-service-connected disability not the result of the veteran's own willful misconduct.