Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/22/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/22/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/26/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/27/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/27/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/27/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/29/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/29/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/06/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/06/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/06/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/06/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/20/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/06/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/18/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 11/01/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/14/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/15/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/28/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/28/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/11/2006