There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To restore the prohibition on the commercial sale and slaughter of wild free-roaming horses and burros.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/25/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/07/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
Action By: Committee on Resources
01/25/2005Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2005Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E60)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/09/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/09/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/09/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/09/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/09/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/09/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/09/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/15/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/15/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/15/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/15/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/07/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/07/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/07/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/07/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/07/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/07/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/07/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/07/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/07/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/07/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/07/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/07/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/09/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/09/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 03/09/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/17/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/17/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/06/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/28/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/05/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/16/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/16/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/16/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/16/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/19/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/19/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/09/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/03/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/07/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/23/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/23/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources01/25/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health02/07/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.297. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/25/2005)

Amends the Wild Free-Roaming Horses and Burros Act to: (1) prohibit the sale or transfer for commercial product processing of any free-roaming horse or burro on U.S. public lands; and (2) repeal the provisions permitting the sale of certain excess animals or their remains, and excluding from criminal fine or imprisonment a person who processes or permits the processing of such animals' remains.