Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/29/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/14/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/21/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/21/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/26/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/24/2006