Refine your search

14 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
08/10/2005 Became Public Law No: 109-59.
08/10/2005 Signed by President.
08/10/2005 Presented to President.
07/29/2005 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 91 - 4. Record Vote Number: 220.
07/29/2005 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 412 - 8 (Roll no. 453).
07/28/2005 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 109-203 filed.(text of conference report: CR H7043-7550)
07/28/2005 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
06/09/2005 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
05/26/2005 To conference: On motion that the House disagree to the Senate amendment, and request a conference Agreed to without objection.(consideration: CR S6060-6061)
05/17/2005 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay. 89 - 11. Record Vote Number: 125.(text: CR 5/20/2005 S5582-5714)
03/10/2005 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 417 - 9 (Roll no. 65).
03/08/2005 Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Transportation, H. Rept. 109-12, Part II.
03/07/2005 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 109-12, Part I.
02/09/2005 Introduced in House