Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/09/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/10/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/07/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 03/07/2005