Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/27/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/27/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/27/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/27/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/27/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/27/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/28/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/11/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/14/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/01/2006