Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/07/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/07/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/09/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/23/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/23/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/25/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/19/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/19/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/19/2006