Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/22/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/22/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/27/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/27/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/27/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/15/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/23/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/23/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/23/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/23/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/19/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/19/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/19/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/19/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/19/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/20/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/20/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/20/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/27/2006