Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/28/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/30/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/11/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/28/2005