Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/23/2005
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/23/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 06/23/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 06/23/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/23/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/30/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/30/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/30/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/20/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/14/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/26/2005