Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/24/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/01/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/14/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/15/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/15/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/23/2006