Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/21/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/21/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/07/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/07/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/08/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/08/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/01/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/09/2006